KY SB188 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - posted in committee
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - posted in committee
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 6 to prohibit the General Assembly from imposing requirements on cities that require city expenditures or tax levies without fully funding the requirement or making the requirements contingent on city legislative body approval; make these provisions inapplicable if the requirements are the result of a federal mandate; ensure that the provisions do not affect KRS 6.950 to 6.975.
Title
AN ACT relating to city mandates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | House | posted in committee |
2017-03-03 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2017-03-02 | House | received in House |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 1, 2017 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-15 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | introduced in Senate |