KY SB182 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 151)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 151)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 45A.380 to allow a local public agency to contract through noncompetitive negotiation when a contract is with a private real estate development and the contract requires the developer to increase the collection capacity of the sanitary sewer or storm water pipe serving the development, with the local public agency only paying for the increase in the collection capacity.
Title
AN ACT relating to local government procurement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 151) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2017-03-14 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2017-03-07 | House | returned to Local Government (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | 1st reading |
2017-03-07 | House | taken from Local Government (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2017-03-03 | House | received in House |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-15 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | introduced in Senate |