KY SB180 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 66.7631 to reallocate a portion of the monthly revenues deposited into the CMRS fund for the purpose of next generation 911 initiatives, services, and applications when certain thresholds are met during a fiscal year; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to the apportionment of money in the CMRS fund and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1647 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-05 | House | received in House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 4, 2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2021-02-26 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Appropriations
Fees
Homeland Security
Public Protection
Public Safety
State Agencies
Technology
Telecommunications
Fees
Homeland Security
Public Protection
Public Safety
State Agencies
Technology
Telecommunications