KY SB18 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch.26)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch.26)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends KRS 156.153 to require that the standards and specifications for accessory equipment and supplies and replacement equipment shall be based on federal safety standards and shall not discriminate among manufacturers unless there is evidence that a specific manufacturer’s product is defective or dangerous to use, to require that the Kentucky Department of Education provide the list of standards and specifications for accessory equipment and supplies and replacement equipment to the Finance and Administration Cabinet for the purpose of maintaining a list of price contracts, and to create a section of KRS Chapter 45A requiring the cabinet to maintain a list of price contracts for procurement of those items.
Title
AN ACT relating to school bus equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 366 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2893 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2893 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch.26) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2024-03-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 25, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | to Education (H) |
2024-02-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-07 | House | received in House |
2024-02-06 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-02-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 05, 2024 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-01-03 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2024-01-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Finance
Motor Vehicles
State Agencies
Traffic Safety
Transportation
Education, Finance
Motor Vehicles
State Agencies
Traffic Safety
Transportation