KY SB175 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 29A.040 to add holders of personal identification cards issued within a county to the master list of potential jurors for that county.
Title
AN ACT relating to juries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | recommitted to Judiciary (S) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-08 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-21 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SB175.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/SB175/bill.pdf |