KY SB175 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Propose to amend the Constitution of Kentucky to create a crime victims' bill of rights; submit to voters.
Title
AN ACT proposing to create a new section of the Constitution of Kentucky relating to crime victims' rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Whitney Westerfield [R] | Sen. Mike Wilson [R] | Sen. Ralph Alvarado [R] | Sen. Jared Carpenter [R] |
Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] | Sen. Chris Girdler [R] | Sen. John Schickel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-03-10 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-03 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2016-03-02 | House | received in House |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-1 with Committee Substitute (1) floor amendment (1) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 1, 2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-02-19 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-18 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |