KY SB174 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 35)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 35)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 189.940 to allow the driver of a public safety vehicle which also meets the definition of a slow-moving vehicle to operate at a speed that may impede or block the normal flow of traffic; amend KRS 189.390 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to slow-moving vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2177 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 323 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2070 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 323 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2070 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 35) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-22 | Senate | passed 37-0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-17 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 17, 2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-11 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | received in House |
2022-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 28, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |