KY SB170 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 260.852 and 260.858 to prohibit production of intoxicating hemp-derived products; amend KRS 260.850 and 218A.010 to conform; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa2 sfta3 RSN# 2109 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | received in House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | passed 23-13 with Floor Amendments (2) and (3-title) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2022-03-09 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-08 | Senate | floor amendment (3-title) filed |
2022-03-07 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed |
2022-03-07 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 07, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-01 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | introduced in Senate |