KY SB170 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - recommitted to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 214 to require health care providers to provide anyone tested for Lyme disease with the detailed results of the test and written information on the effectiveness of the test for Lyme disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to Lyme disease.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06Senaterecommitted to Health & Welfare (S)
2018-03-06Senatetaken from Rules (S)
2018-03-01Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-28Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-02-21Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2018-02-20Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback