KY SB17 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-03 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 337.010 to increase the applicable threshold of employees of retail stores and service industries from $95,000 to $500,000 average annual gross volume of sales for the employer; amend KRS 337.275 to raise the state minimum wage to $8.20 per hour on July 1, 2018, to $9.15 per hour on July 1, 2019, to $10.10 per hour on July 1, 2020, to $11.00 per hour on July 1, 2021, to $12.05 per hour on July 1, 2022, to $13.10 per hour on July 1, 2023, to $13.95 per hour on July 1, 2024, and to $15.00 per hour on July 1, 2025, and to raise the state minimum wage for tipped employees to $2.13 per hour on the effective date of the Act, to $3.05 per hour on July 1, 2019, to $3.95 per hour on July 1, 2020, and to $4.90 per hour on July 1, 2021; include anti-preemption language permitting local governments to establish minimum wage ordinances in excess of the state minimum wage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to wages.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-03Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-01-02Senateintroduced in Senate
2017-11-20SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback