KY SB167 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 48.020, relating to branch budget recommendations, to make technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to branch budget recommendations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15Senaterecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-03-26Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-19Senatefloor amendments (1), (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-19Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1)
2020-02-18Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-02-13Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback