KY SB165 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 151)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 151)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 424.145 to require the URL of the notice web site and notice to be no more than 30 characters in length in easily comprehended terms.
Title
AN ACT relating to financial transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 410 (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 409 (Y: 60 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1804 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1791 (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 356 (Y: 71 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 1640 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 409 (Y: 60 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1804 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1791 (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 356 (Y: 71 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 1640 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 151) |
2021-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | received in Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Bill passed 66-26 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | veto overridden |
2021-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-03-29 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | received in House |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill passed 22-14 |
2021-03-29 | House | veto overridden |
2021-03-29 | House | posted for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-03-29 | House | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-29 | House | received in Senate |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Vetoed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Bill passed 24-9 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 71-26 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-15 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-15 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-12 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-12 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2021-03-12 | House | 1st reading |
2021-03-12 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-05 | House | received in House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Charter County Government
Cities
Consolidated Local Governments
Counties of 75,000 or More
Counties, Charter
Counties, Urban
Local Government
Local Mandate
Notices
Publications
Unified Local Governments
Cities
Consolidated Local Governments
Counties of 75,000 or More
Counties, Charter
Counties, Urban
Local Government
Local Mandate
Notices
Publications
Unified Local Governments