KY SB161 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 089)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 15.525, relating to programs created by law enforcement agencies to refer persons for substance use treatment, to delete the requirement that the person seeking assistance be immediately paired with a volunteer mentor; provide that a person is ineligible for the program if he or she places law enforcement in reasonable apprehension of physical injury; clarify that information gathered on program participants is exempt from the Kentucky Open Records Act; provide criminal and civil immunity for those who provide referrals and services pursuant to the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to law enforcement programs for substance use treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 301 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 869 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 089)
2019-03-13Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-13Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-13Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-13Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-12House3rd reading, passed 100-0
2019-03-07Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-06Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-03-01Houseposted in committee
2019-02-27Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-02-26Housereceived in House
2019-02-26Senate3rd reading, passed 36-1
2019-02-26Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2019-02-22Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-21Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-11Senateto Judiciary (S)
2019-02-08Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback