KY SB160 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 31)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 31)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reorganize Office of the Attorney General.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Department of Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 239 (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 1250 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 1250 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 31) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-17 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-4 |
2020-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-28 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | received in House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 with floor amendment (1) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-20 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-13 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | introduced in Senate |