KY SB158 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-10 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-10 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the office of the Auditor of Public Accounts to enter into a contract with a third party to conduct a performance review of the Department of Juvenile Justice within the Justice and Public Safety Cabinet; establish the authority of the third-party entity and the scope of the review; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to juvenile justice and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 scta1 RSN# 2556 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2023-03-10 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-10 | House | 2nd reading |
2023-03-10 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-09 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-09 | House | 1st reading |
2023-03-09 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-07 | House | received in House |
2023-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Floor Amendment (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 07, 2023 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-01 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2023-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Appropriations
Auditor of Public Accounts
Children and Minors
Crimes and Punishments
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies
Auditor of Public Accounts
Children and Minors
Crimes and Punishments
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies