KY SB158 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 112)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 158.6455 to clarify the components of the statewide accountability system; require state indicators be evaluated on "status" and "change" and define the terms; require a school's overall performance, status, and change to be displayed on an online dashboard; amend KRS 160.346 to revise the criteria for determining targeted support and improvement and additional targeted support and improvement; prohibit the Department of Education from serving as the turnaround audit team or turnaround entity and from approving the school's audit team or turnaround entity; remove the principal evaluation and reassignment provisions from the audit and turnaround process; require the department to provide audit and turnaround intervention funds to districts identified for comprehensive support and improvement; amend KRS 156.160 to prohibit high school graduation requirements from including a postsecondary readiness indicator used in the state accountability system or a minimum score on a statewide assessment; amend KRS 158.140 to prohibit a local board from requiring achievement of a minimum score on a statewide assessment as a high school graduation requirement; amend KRS 160.1594 to prohibit charter authorizer training for local school boards until a charter application is received; amend KRS 158.6453 to require scores on IB examinations of 4 or higher to be included on the school report card; add noncodified language encouraging the department to assign more weight in the accountability system for progress made by subgroups toward goals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 363 (Y: 81 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1280 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-24Senatesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 112)
2020-04-15Senatedelivered to Governor
2020-04-15Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-04-15Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-04-15Senatereceived in Senate
2020-04-14House3rd reading, passed 81-6
2020-04-14Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day
2020-04-14Housetaken from Rules
2020-03-19House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-18Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2020-03-18Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-03-17Houseposted in committee
2020-03-09Houseto Education (H)
2020-03-05Housereceived in House
2020-03-04Senatepassed 32-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-04Senatefloor amendment (1) withdrawn
2020-03-04Senate3rd reading
2020-03-03Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-02Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 4, 2020
2020-02-28Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-27Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-12Senateto Education (S)
2020-02-10Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback