KY SB156 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 141.023 to update statutory language.
Title
AN ACT relating to taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-03-12 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/21RS/sb156.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/21RS/sb156/orig_bill.pdf |