KY SB155 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.690 to insert gender-neutral language.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Education and Workforce Development Cabinet, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. George Wise [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SCTA 1 RSN# 585 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 585 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 585 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | to Education (H) |
2018-03-21 | House | received in House |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) & committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) & Committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |