KY SB150 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 010)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of Chapter 237 to allow concealed deadly weapons to be carried by persons age 21 and over without a license in same locations where concealed carry license holders may carry them; amend KRS 527.020 and 237.115 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to carrying concealed weapons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 196 (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 195 (Y: 29 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Adopt HFA 7 RCS# 194 (Y: 34 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Adopt HFA 3 RCS# 193 (Y: 30 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 192 (Y: 31 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 191 (Y: 33 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 802 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 010)
2019-03-04Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-04Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-04Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-04Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-01Housepassed 60-37
2019-03-01Housefloor amendment (4) ruled in violation of Rules
2019-03-01Housefloor amendments (3) and (7) defeated
2019-03-01Housefloor amendments (16) and (17) ruled not germane
2019-03-01House3rd reading
2019-03-01Housefloor amendments (19), (20), (21) and (22) filed
2019-03-01Housefloor amendment (11) withdrawn
2019-02-28Housefloor amendments (6) (7) (8) (9) (10) (11) (12) (13) (14) (15) (16) (17) and (18) filed
2019-02-28Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019
2019-02-28Housetaken from Rules
2019-02-28House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-27Housefloor amendments (4) and (5-title) filed
2019-02-27Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-25Houseposted in committee
2019-02-21Housefloor amendments (1), (2) and (3) filed
2019-02-19Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-02-15Housereceived in House
2019-02-14Senate3rd reading, passed 29-8
2019-02-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 14, 2019
2019-02-14Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2019-02-12Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-12Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2019-02-12Senate2nd reading
2019-02-12Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2019-02-11Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2019-02-11Senate1st reading
2019-02-11Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2019-02-11Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb150.html
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb150/orig_bill.pdf
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb150/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA6.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA7.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA8.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA9.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA10.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA11.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA12.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA13.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA14.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA15.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA16.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA17.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA18.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA19.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA20.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA21.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB150/HFA22.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb150/LM.pdf
Roll Callhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb150/vote_history.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb150/CI.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback