KY SB150 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 198B.662 to remove outdated sections and allow for the licensure of journeymen heating, ventilation, and air conditioning mechanics who can document experience prior to July 1, 1995.
Title
AN ACT relating to the licensure of journeyman heating, ventilation, and air conditioning mechanics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-04 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-04 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-03 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2011-03-03 | received in Senate | |
2011-03-03 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 | |
2011-03-02 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2011 | |
2011-03-02 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2011-03-01 | posting waived | |
2011-03-01 | returned to Licensing & Occupations (H) | |
2011-03-01 | 1st reading | |
2011-03-01 | taken from Licensing & Occupations (H) | |
2011-02-28 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-22 | to Licensing & Occupations (H) | |
2011-02-18 | received in House | |
2011-02-17 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 | |
2011-02-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 17, 2011 | |
2011-02-15 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-14 | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) | |
2011-02-14 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-02-14 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-14 | taken from Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-02-10 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB150.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB150/bill.doc |