KY SB15 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts ch. 85)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts ch. 85)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Propose to create a new section of the Constitution of Kentucky to established a crime victims' bill of rights; submit to voters.
Title
AN ACT proposing to create a new section of the Constitution of Kentucky relating to crime victims' rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Whitney Westerfield [R] | Sen. Damon Thayer [R] | Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Sen. Rick Girdler [R] |
Sen. Denise Harper Angel [D] | Sen. Reginald Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 350 (Y: 74 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1249 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1249 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts ch. 85) |
2020-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 74-15 |
2020-04-14 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2020-04-14 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-11 | House | reassigned to Elections, Const. Amendments, & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2020-02-28 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | received in House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-6-1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-13 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |