KY SB144 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 118)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 118)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 43.070 to allow clerks and sheriffs to enter into an agreement with the Auditor of Public Accounts to satisfy statutory audit requirements by entering into an agreed-upon procedures engagement that will be performed by the Auditor.
Title
AN ACT relating to audits of county officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/HFA 2 RSN# 642 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 402 (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 471 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 402 (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 471 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 118) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Bill passed 37-0 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House floor amendment (2) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendment (2) on Tuesday, March 27, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-3 with floor amendment (2) |
2018-03-19 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2018-03-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 19, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-14 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2018-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-01 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | received in House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-14 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | introduced in Senate |