KY SB140 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 60)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 60)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend 164.540 to authorize the Council on Postsecondary Education to enter into the State Authorization Reciprocity Agreement, for the purpose of authorizing a postsecondary institution located in another state to provide distance education to Kentucky residents; serve as the lead or "portal" agency responsible for contact with other states on matters pertaining to interstate reciprocity agreements; promulgate administrative regulations.
Title
AN ACT relating to interstate distance education among postsecondary institutions.
Sponsors
Sen. George Wise [R] | Sen. Mike Wilson [R] | Sen. Gerald Neal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 60) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-29 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2016-03-28 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2016 |
2016-03-28 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-25 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 28, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day |
2016-03-23 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-18 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-07 | House | to Education (H) |
2016-03-04 | House | received in House |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2016 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-01 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2016-01-29 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB140.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB140/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB140/vote_history.pdf |