KY SB139 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 100.111, 132.010, 148.001, 150.010, 151.100, 154.1-010, 176.051, 186.010, 189.222, 211.015, 217.544, 217B.040, 224.71-100, 247.010, 249.350, 253.010, 253.070, 253.130, 253.990, 256.010, 256.030, 256.080, 256.090, 261.200, 262.910, 281.605, 433.255, and 446.010 to define the term "livestock"; amend KRS 186.675 and 224.71-110 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to livestock.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-15Senatedelivered to Governor
2017-03-15Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2017-03-15Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2017-03-15Senatereceived in Senate
2017-03-15House3rd reading, passed 97-0
2017-03-14Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017
2017-03-08Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
2017-03-07Houseposted in committee
2017-03-07Housereturned to Agriculture (H)
2017-03-07House1st reading
2017-03-07Housetaken from Agriculture (H)
2017-03-06Houseto Agriculture (H)
2017-03-03Housereceived in House
2017-03-02Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0 with committee amendment (1)
2017-03-02Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 2, 2017
2017-03-01Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-28Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with committee amendment (1)
2017-02-09Senateto Agriculture (S)
2017-02-08Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback