KY SB139 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - recommitted to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 311.1953 to require the medical examiner or coroner to release identifying information and relevant postmortem examination results to the procurement organization if a decedent's body or part is medically suitable for transplantation or therapy; title the Act as Courtney's Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to organ donation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-22Senaterecommitted to Health & Welfare (S)
2016-02-18Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2016-02-11Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2016-02-10Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2016-02-01Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2016-01-28Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback