KY SB138 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-10 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-10 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 161.102 to require the Education Professional Standards Board to issue substitute teacher certificates based on education attained; specify what type of employment the certificates are valid for.
Title
AN ACT relating to substitute teacher certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2566 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | to Education (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | received in House |
2023-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36 -0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 08, 2023 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-02-17 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |