KY SB137 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 431.064 to require a twelve-hour hold prior to release on bail for domestic violence perpetrators if the pretrial assessment indicates a risk of future harm to the victim.
Title
AN ACT relating to domestic violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2015-03-09 | House | posting waived |
2015-03-09 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2015-03-09 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | 2nd reading |
2015-03-09 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-03 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | received in House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-2 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-11 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |