KY SB129 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 79)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 79)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.6455 to add a Kentucky Department of Education technical advisory committee for purposes of advising the department on assessment and accountability in place of the NTAPAA; require reports of advice be reported to the Office of Education Accountability; amend KRS 156.160 and 158.6453 to conform; repeal KRS 158.6454.
Title
AN ACT relating to education.
Sponsors
Sen. George Wise [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1726 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 273 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 272 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1574 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 273 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 272 (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1574 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 79) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Bill passed 36-0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House floor amendment (1) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendment (1) for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2021-03-04 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2021-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-01 | House | to Education (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | received in House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |