KY SB126 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - returned to the Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 151B.020 and 151B.280 to delete references to the Office of Unemployment Insurance, the Unemployment Insurance Commission, the Career Development Office, and the Division of Operations and Support Services; amend KRS 336.015 to include the Office of Unemployment Insurance, Unemployment Insurance Commission, the Career Development Office, and the Division of Operations and Support Services in the Labor Cabinet; amend KRS 336.020 to provide that the Office of Unemployment Insurance shall be in the Labor Cabinet and headed by an executive director appointed by the Governor and to create an additional legal division; amend KRS 12.020 to reorganize and remove the Office of Unemployment Insurance, the Unemployment Insurance Commission, the Career Development Office, and the Division of Operations and Support Services from the Education and Workforce Development Cabinet and Department of Workforce Investment and place them in the Labor Cabinet; amend KRS 14A.7-030, 141.065, 341.005, 341.080, 341.110, 341.125, 341.145, 341.190, 341.230, 341.245, 341.250, 341.260, 341.270, 341.275, 341.300, 341.360, 341.370, 341.415, 341.440, 341.470, 341.530, 341.540, and 341.990 to conform; confirm Executive Order 2020-686.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to reorganization and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 454 (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 453 (Y: 72 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 1632 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30Housereturned to the Orders of the Day
2021-03-30Housefloor amendment (1) ruled not germane
2021-03-30Housefloor amendment (3) adopted
2021-03-30House3rd reading
2021-03-30Housefloor amendments (1), (2-title), (3) and (4-title) filed
2021-03-12Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021
2021-03-12Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2021-03-11Houseposted in committee
2021-03-11Houseto State Government (H)
2021-03-11Housereturned to Committee on Committees (H)
2021-03-11House1st reading
2021-03-11Housetaken from Committee on Committees (H)
2021-03-04Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-03-04Housereceived in House
2021-03-03Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-03-02Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2021
2021-03-02Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) as a consent bill
2021-03-01Senatereturned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
2021-03-01Senate2nd reading
2021-03-01Senatetaken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
2021-02-26Senatereturned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
2021-02-26Senate1st reading
2021-02-26Senatetaken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
2021-02-22Senateto Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
2021-02-02Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-02-02Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback