KY SB123 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 113)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 113)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 216B to prohibit the state health plan from permitting more than a total of two applications establishing nursing facility beds in a freestanding facility or as part of an existing facility under a pilot program for post-acute transitional care; require these applications to be for facilities located in urban core-based statistical areas.
Title
AN ACT relating to nursing facility beds approved by the state health plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/HCS 1 RSN# 640 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 414 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 451 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 414 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 451 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 113) |
2018-04-10 | Senate | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2018-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Bill passed 37-0 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) on Tuesday, March 27, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute |
2018-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill |
2018-03-16 | House | returned to Health and Family Services (H) |
2018-03-16 | House | 2nd reading |
2018-03-16 | House | taken from Health and Family Services (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | returned to Health and Family Services (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | 1st reading |
2018-03-15 | House | taken from Health and Family Services (H) |
2018-03-13 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-27 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2018-02-23 | House | received in House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-02 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | introduced in Senate |