KY SB120 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 158)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 17.510 to provide that juveniles adjudicated in other states are not required to register in Kentucky and make the provision retroactive; amend KRS 453.190 to define a "poor person" as one who has an income at or below 100% on the Supreme Court's sliding scale of indigency; amend KRS 534.060 to provide that no person shall be imprisoned for nonpayment of fines or court costs unless the failure to pay was willful and not due to an inability to pay; amend KRS 534.070 to raise the daily credit against a fine or court costs for time served to $75 per day or $150 per day if the defendant works at a community service or community labor program; provide that a jailer shall release the defendant, unless the defendant is incarcerated on other orders, once he or she has sufficient credit to satisfy the fine or court costs; amend KRS 23A.205 and 24A.175 to provide that if a defendant is a poor person and that he or she is unable to pay court costs in the foreseeable future, the defendant shall not be ordered to pay court costs or placed in jail for failing to pay court costs; amend various statutes to conform; amend KRS 439.250 and 439.345 to provide supervised compliance credits for some individuals on probation, parole, and post-release supervision; amend KRS 439.3108 to increase the time the Department of Corrections or the Parole Board can place a supervised individual who violates the conditions of community supervision in a detention facility; amend KRS 439.3401 to prohibit those convicted of manslaughter in the 2nd degree, reckless homicide, fetal homicide in the 3rd degree, and fetal homicide in the 4th degree from being paroled until he or she serves at least 50% of the sentence imposed; prohibit those convicted of a violation of manslaughter in the second degree or reckless homicide, when the victim was a peace officer or firefighter killed in the line of duty, from being paroled until he or she serves at least 85% of the sentence imposed; amend KRS 439.3406 to prohibit an inmate from being placed on mandatory reentry supervision if the inmate has not served at least 6 months since he or she was recommitted for a violation or has twice been released on mandatory reentry supervision; create new sections of KRS Chapter 439 to require the Department of Corrections to implement a reentry drug supervision pilot program for certain inmates and parolees with substance use disorders; create a new section of KRS Chapter 15 to allow law enforcement organizations to create Angel Initiative Programs; amend KRS 202A.121 to allow appointed counsel access to records; create a new section of KRS Chapter 197 to allow the Department of Corrections to administer a Prison Industry Enhancement Certification Program (PIECP); create a new section of KRS Chapter 196 to require the Kentucky State Corrections Commission to oversee a PIECP; amend various sections in KRS Chapter 335B relating to employment and licensure of persons convicted of crimes to narrow the class of offenses to which the chapter applies, to add consideration of the passage of time since the commission of the offense to the criteria considered in making licensure decisions, to delete language relating to a hiring or licensing authority's subjective view of an ex-offender's rehabilitation, and to require an open hearing prior to a license denial for an ex-offender; repeal, reenact, and amend KRS 335B.060 to exempt peace officers and other law enforcement personnel; repeal KRS 335B.040; amend various statutes to conform; amend KRS 532.100 to allow Class C and D felons eligible for placement in a local jail to participate in an approved community work program or other form of work release with the approval of the Department of Corrections; create a new section of KRS Chapter 533 to allow jails to operate a day reporting program; create new sections of KRS Chapter 441 to operate a reentry center with the approval of the Department of Corrections; amend various statutes to conform; amend KRS 15.280 to provide that the Criminal Justice Statistical Analysis Center is not the record custodian of the data sent to the center; amend KRS 15A.075 to reconstitute the Criminal Justice Counsel; create new sections of KRS Chapter 197 to specify how cost savings shall be calculated and create the criminal justice reinvestment fund to collect and appropriate those savings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 158)
2017-03-29Senatedelivered to Governor
2017-03-29Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2017-03-29Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2017-03-29SenateBill passed 36-0
2017-03-29SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute (2)
2017-03-29Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (2) for Wednesday, March 29, 2017
2017-03-29Senateto Rules (S)
2017-03-15Senatereceived in Senate
2017-03-15House3rd reading, passed 85-9 with Committee Substitute (2)
2017-03-15Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017
2017-03-15Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2)
2017-03-14Housefloor amendment (5) filed to Committee Substitute and floor amendment (6) filed
2017-03-14Houseposted in committee
2017-03-14Houserecommitted to Judiciary (H)
2017-03-14Housetaken from the Orders of the Day
2017-03-08Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2017
2017-03-07Housefloor amendment (1), (2), (3), and (4) filed to Committee Substitute
2017-03-07Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2017-03-06Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2017-03-06House1st reading
2017-03-06Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2017-02-28Houseposted in committee
2017-02-28Houseto Judiciary (H)
2017-02-27Housereceived in House
2017-02-24Senate3rd reading, passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute
2017-02-24Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2017
2017-02-23Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2017-02-16Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2017-02-16Senate1st reading
2017-02-16Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2017-02-10Senateto Judiciary (S)
2017-02-09Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/SB120.htm
Texthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB120/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB120/SCS1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB120/HCS1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB120/HFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB120/HFA2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB120/HFA3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB120/HFA4.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB120/HFA5.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB120/HFA6.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB120/HCS2.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/SB120/vote_history.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB120/LM.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB120/SCS1LM.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB120/CI.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB120/SCS1CI.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB120/HCS1LM.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB120/HCS1CI.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB120/HCS2LM.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/SB120/HCS2CI.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback