KY SB120 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 33)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 33)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal and reenact KRS 286.3-065 to apply the standards of conduct in KRS 271B.8-300 and 271B.8-420, respectively, to the directors and officers of a bank.
Title
AN ACT relating to bank officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Buford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 33) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-23 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2016-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2016 |
2016-03-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-18 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-11 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-16 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | received in House |
2016-02-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2016-02-09 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2016-02-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-25 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | introduced in Senate |