KY SB119 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 7)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 7)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.095 to require the Department of Education to develop and maintain in a list of available child abuse and neglect prevention, recognition, and reporting training for school administrators, certified personnel, and classified personnel; require local school boards to adopt the developed training.
Title
AN ACT relating to child abuse and neglect prevention, recognition, and reporting training for school personnel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 7) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Bill passed 32-4 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-8 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-03 | House | posted in committee |
2015-03-03 | House | returned to Education (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | 2nd reading |
2015-03-03 | House | taken from Education (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | posting waived |
2015-03-02 | House | returned to Education (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-02 | House | taken from Education (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | to Education (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | received in House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 23, 2015 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-06 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |