KY SB118 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 304-17A.148 to cap the cost-sharing requirements for prescription insulin at $100 per 30-day supply; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2021.
Title
AN ACT relating to prescription insulin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-01-29 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/sb118.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/sb118/orig_bill.pdf |