KY SB117 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 036)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 036)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.574 to add fees in lieu of court costs for county-attorney-operated traffic safety school programs and provide for the distribution of funds collected.
Title
AN ACT relating to county attorney operated traffic safety programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 036) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-2 |
2015-03-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-03 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-03 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2015-03-02 | House | posting waived |
2015-03-02 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-02 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | received in House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0-1with floor amendment (1) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2015-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 20, 2015 |
2015-02-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |