KY SB115 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 15.380 to require local alcohol beverage control investigators appointed under KRS Chapter 241 to receive certification from the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council; exempt local alcohol beverage control investigators appointed before April 1, 2019, from the certification requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverage control investigators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 380 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 828 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-14House3rd reading, passed 99-1
2019-03-13Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-12Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2019-03-07Housereturned to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2019-03-07House1st reading
2019-03-07Housetaken from Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2019-03-01Houseposted in committee
2019-02-25Houseto Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2019-02-22Housereceived in House
2019-02-21Senate3rd reading, passed 34-0
2019-02-21Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2019
2019-02-20Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-19Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-08Senateto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2019-02-05Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback