KY SB110 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-14 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 154)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-14 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 154)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 241 to codify the quota license system for alcoholic beverages for wet counties; create a new section of KRS Chapter 241 to codify the quota license system for alcoholic beverages for wet cities; create a new section of KRS Chapter 241 to specify the department's process for verifying quota numbers; create a new section of KRS Chapter 241 to allow a city or county to petition for a quota increase and establish criteria for the board to consider; create a new section of KRS Chapter 242 to outline petition requirements; create a new section of KRS Chapter 243 to notify quota license holders that quotas may be increased; amend KRS 241.065 to conform with population data; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to quota licenses for alcohol and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jimmy Higdon [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 461 (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 485 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 485 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-14 | Senate | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 154) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2018-04-02 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-02 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-02 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-04-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 79-12 |
2018-03-27 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2018-03-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2018-03-21 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-21 | House | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2018-03-21 | House | 2nd reading |
2018-03-21 | House | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2018-03-20 | House | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2018-03-20 | House | 1st reading |
2018-03-20 | House | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2018-03-06 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2018-03-02 | House | received in House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | passed 32-4 with Committee Substitute (1) & floor amendment (9) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | floor amendment (8) withdrawn |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | floor amendments (1) (2) (3) (4) (5) (6-title) (7) (10) and (11) withdrawn |
2018-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 1, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | floor amendment (8) filed to Committee Substitute |
2018-02-20 | Senate | floor amendments (9) & (10) filed to Committee Substitute & floor amendment (11) filed to Bill |
2018-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-13 | Senate | floor amendments (1) (2) & (3) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendments (4) (5) (6-title) (7) filed to Bill |
2018-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | introduced in Senate |