KY SB11 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 20)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 194A.700 to delete, amend, and add definitions; amend KRS 194A.703 to replace "client" with "resident" and to include requirements for living units in a dementia care unit; amend KRS 194A.705 to allow assisted living communities to provide additional services; amend KRS 194A.707 to change the administrative procedure process of assisted living communities, to add a biennial review process, and to change the certification process to a licensure process; amend KRS 194A.709 to remove the requirement of reporting to the Division of Health Care and to make technical language changes; amend KRS 194A.711 to revise the criteria to be met by residents in an assisted living community; amend KRS 194A.717 to include staffing needs pursuant to an assisted living community's service plan; amend KRS 194A.719 to require orientation education prior to independently working with residents; amend KRS 194A.727 to clarify which businesses can be licensed as an assisted living community; create multiple new sections of KRS 194A.700 to 194A.729 to provide requirements for the cabinet to consider when an applicant is seeking a license as an assisted living community with dementia care; for when a licensee chooses to voluntary relinquishment of a license as an assisted living community with dementia care; to list the responsibilities of an assisted living community with dementia care; to require continuing education training for assisted living managers of an assisted living community with dementia care; to require assisted living communities with dementia care to develop and implement additional policies; to provide staffing requirements for individuals employed in assisted living communities with dementia care; to include additional services an assisted living community with dementia care must provide; to list training requirements for staff working in dementia care units; to establish two categories of licensure for assisted living communities and to require assisted living communities to obtain a license from the cabinet to operate as a dementia care unit; to allow licensed personal care homes, under specific circumstances, to be licensed as an assisted living community or assisted living community with dementia care; to establish the rules for fines and violations of an assisted living community; amend KRS 216.510 and 216.535 to expand the definition of "long-term care facilities" to include assisted living communities; amend KRS 216.535 to amend the definition of "long-term care ombudsman" to exclude assisted living communities; amend KRS 216.530 to amend the inspection period for assisted living communities, personal care homes, and specialized personal care homes; amend KRS 216.557 to exclude assisted living communities from receiving citations as type A or type B violations; amend KRS 216.515, 216.560, 216.563, 216.565, 216.577, 216A.030, and 218A.180 to exclude assisted living communities; amend KRS 216.765 to require a specific medical examination in the admission into assisted living communities; amend KRS 216.573 to broaden the cabinet's power to institute injunctive proceedings; create a new section of KRS Chapter 216 to create new definitions; to establish rules for residence in a personal care home or a specialized personal care home; to allow a personal care home or specialized personal care to provide additional services in certain situations; to establish staffing requirements in personal care homes or specialized personal care homes; to require the cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations to regulate an initial and biennial licensure review process and to establish additional procedures; and to allow the cabinet to request information and to conduct on-site visits; amend KRS 216B.015 to expand the definition of "health facility"; amend KRS 216B.155 to add the exemption of assisted living communities from specific standard requirements; amend KRS 216B.160 to allow a manager's designee in an assisted living community to conduct an ongoing assessment; amend various sections of KRS Chapter 194A and KRS 216.595 to make technical corrections and changes; repeal KRS 194A.723 and 194A.724.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to long-term care facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 237 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1959 (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-18Senatesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 20)
2022-03-09Senatedelivered to Governor
2022-03-09Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2022-03-09Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2022-03-09Senatereceived in Senate
2022-03-08House3rd reading, passed 94-0
2022-03-07Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 08, 2022
2022-03-04House2nd reading, to Rules
2022-03-03Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2022-02-24Houseto Health & Family Services (H)
2022-01-19Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2022-01-19Housereceived in House
2022-01-18Senate3rd reading, passed 30-2 with Committee Substitute
2022-01-13Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 18, 2022
2022-01-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2022-01-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2022-01-04Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2022-01-04Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2022-01-04Senateintroduced in Senate
2021-10-13SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback