KY SB11 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 512 to specify that a tenant who, having no right to do so or any reasonable ground to believe that he or she has such right, intentionally or wantonly defaces, destroys, or damages residential rental property is to be charged with violating KRS 512.020, 512.030, or 512.040 as appropriate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to criminal damage to rental property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1456 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 352 (Y: 74 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCA 1 RSN# 1151 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-24SenateVetoed
2020-04-15Senatedelivered to Governor
2020-04-15Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-04-15Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-04-15Senatepassed 31-3
2020-04-15SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1)
2020-04-15Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
2020-04-14Senateto Rules (S)
2020-04-14Senatereceived in Senate
2020-04-14House3rd reading, passed 74-14 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-04-14Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day
2020-04-14Housetaken from Rules
2020-03-19House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-18Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-01-24Houseposted in committee
2020-01-22Houseto Judiciary (H)
2020-01-17Housereceived in House
2020-01-16Senate3rd reading, passed 29-5 with committee amendment (1)
2020-01-16Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 16, 2020
2020-01-15Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-14Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1)
2020-01-08Senateto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate
2019-06-04SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback