KY SB109 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 34)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 34)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 510.010 to include penetration by body parts in definitions of "sexual intercourse" and " deviate sexual intercourse" for purposes of describing the crimes of rape and sodomy.
Title
AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments.
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Sen. Denise Harper Angel [D] | Sen. Alice Kerr [R] | Sen. Morgan McGarvey [D] |
Sen. Wil Schroder [R] | Sen. Whitney Westerfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 337 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 450 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 450 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 34) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-0 |
2018-03-15 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-27 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-02-23 | House | received in House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-08 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-01-26 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | introduced in Senate |