KY SB109 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 159.010 to permit, beginning with the 2014-2015 school year, each local board of education on the recommendation of the superintendent and approval of the Kentucky Department of Education to require children residing in the school district's attendance area to attend school until the child has reached his or her eighteenth birthday except as provided in KRS 159.030; amend KRS 159.020 to conform; make technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT relating to compulsory attendance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-03-29 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-28 | 3rd reading, passed 77-14 with Committee Substitute (2) | |
2012-03-28 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 28, 2012 | |
2012-03-28 | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute (2) | |
2012-03-27 | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute (2) | |
2012-03-27 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) | |
2012-03-26 | reassigned to Education (H) | |
2012-02-28 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-02-28 | taken from Rules | |
2012-02-23 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-22 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-21 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-15 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-14 | to Education (H) | |
2012-02-09 | received in House | |
2012-02-08 | 3rd reading, passed 35-2 | |
2012-02-07 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 8, 2012 | |
2012-02-06 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | to Education (S) | |
2012-01-23 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB109.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB109/bill.doc |