KY SB107 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 532.130, 532.135, and 532.140 to add a diagnosis of serious mental illness to the disabilities which prevent execution for persons convicted of capital offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to mental illness.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15Senaterecommitted to Judiciary (S)
2018-03-02Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-01Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-01-24Senateto Judiciary (S)
2018-01-23Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback