KY SB107 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 80)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 80)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 205.8477 to establish that Medicaid providers shall provide operating disclosures to the Cabinet for Health and Family Services and to other entities in established circumstances.
Title
AN ACT relating to health providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 80) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-23 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Bill passed 36-1 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute |
2015-03-23 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute |
2015-03-23 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-03-09 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2015-03-03 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 5, 2015 |
2015-03-03 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-02 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-25 | House | posting waived |
2015-02-25 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-24 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | received in House |
2015-02-13 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-0 |
2015-02-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |