KY SB105 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 85)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 85)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 214.155 to include cytomegalovirus (CMV) testing as part of the newborn screening program; create a new section of KRS Chapter 214 to require the Department for Public Health in the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to provide public educational resources related to CMV; provide that the Act may be cited as the Bella Dawn Streeval Law.
Title
AN ACT relating to newborn and infant screenings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 460 (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2002 (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2002 (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 85) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-2 |
2022-03-30 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn |
2022-03-29 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2022-03-29 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-23 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | received in House |
2022-02-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 30-2 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 07, 2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | introduced in Senate |