KY SB104 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 70)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 278.992 to ensure state penalties for violations of the Natural Gas Pipeline Safety Act conform with federal penalties; amend KRS 367.4903 to define "commission" as the Public Service Commission for the Underground Facility Damage Prevention Act of 1994; amend KRS 367.4909 to require underground facility operators to report to the commission excavation damage to an underground facility used in the transportation of gas or hazardous liquid; amend KRS 367.4911 to conform; amend KRS 367. 4917 to authorize the commission to enforce and assess civil penalties for damages to an underground facility used in the transportation of gas or hazardous liquid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to natural gas pipeline safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 387 (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 469 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 469 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 70)
2018-03-22Senatedelivered to Governor
2018-03-22Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-22Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-22Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-21House3rd reading, passed 86-6
2018-03-15Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018
2018-03-09House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-08Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-03-06Houseposted in committee
2018-03-01Houseto Natural Resources & Energy (H)
2018-02-27Housereceived in House
2018-02-26Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-02-23Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 26, 2018
2018-02-15Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-14Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-01-24Senateto Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2018-01-23Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback