KY SB103 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 046)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 64.090 to allow sheriffs to charge $25 for the handling of an impounded vehicle and $25 per day for the storage of an impounded vehicle; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to sheriffs and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 977 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 304 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 840 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 046)
2019-03-14Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-13SenateBill passed 32-5
2019-03-13SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-13Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) on Wednesday, March 13, 2019
2019-03-13Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-12House3rd reading, passed 99-1 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-07Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-06Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-28Houseposted in committee
2019-02-26Houseto Local Government (H)
2019-02-25Housereceived in House
2019-02-22Senate3rd reading, passed 35-0
2019-02-22Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019
2019-02-21Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-08Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2019-02-05Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback