KY SB103 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 59)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 59)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 367 to define "cemetery merchandise," "declarant," "declaration," "designee," "funeral," and "funeral merchandise"; establish the uses and requirements for a declaration; permit declarations to specify preferences for the disposition of remains after death; establish that the most recent declaration shall take precedence over other documents concerning disposition of remains; grant persons following a declaration in good-faith immunity from liability; specify requirements to revoke a declaration and specify actions that can cause the revocation of a designation; specify chain of authority if the person with authority under the declaration or statute fails to assume the obligation; limit reciprocity with other states; specify requirements for contesting the validity of a declaration; amend KRS 367.97501 to delete the definition of "authorizing agent," amend the definition of "cremation authorization form," define "declaration," and delete the definition of "preneed cremation authorization form; amend KRS 367.97514 to conform; amend KRS 367.97524 to include funeral home; amend KRS 367.97527 to replace the use of a preneed cremation authorization form with the use of a declaration; amend KRS 367.97514 to conform; amend KRS 367.97531 to allow the authorizing agent to submit a form by facsimile transmission.
Title
AN ACT relating to funeral planning.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Hornback [R] | Sen. John Schickel [R] | Sen. Jared Carpenter [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] |
Sen. Chris Girdler [R] | Sen. Ray Jones [D] | Sen. Dorsey Ridley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 59) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2016-03-25 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2016-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2016-03-22 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2016-03-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-10 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-09 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2016-02-05 | House | received in House |
2016-02-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 4 |
2016-01-29 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-01-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2016-01-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |