KY SB102 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 531.300 to add definitions for "child sex doll" and "traffic"; create new sections of KRS Chapter 531 to prohibit the possession of a child sex doll, the trafficking of a child sex doll, and the importing of a child sex doll; amend KRS 531.340 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 824 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2019-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-22 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | received in House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |