KY SB102 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 531.300 to add definitions for "child sex doll" and "traffic"; create new sections of KRS Chapter 531 to prohibit the possession of a child sex doll, the trafficking of a child sex doll, and the importing of a child sex doll; amend KRS 531.340 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 824 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-03-04Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-02-28House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-27Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-25Houseposted in committee
2019-02-22Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-02-21Housereceived in House
2019-02-20Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-19Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 20, 2019
2019-02-15Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-14Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-07Senateto Judiciary (S)
2019-02-05Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb102.html
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb102/orig_bill.pdf
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb102/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB102/SCS1.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb102/SCS1CI.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb102/SCS1LM.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/SB102/HFA1.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb102/LM.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/sb102/CI.pdf
Roll Callhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb102/vote_history.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback