KY SB101 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 40)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 40)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 157.069 to provide that when a local board of education assumes management of a state-operated vocational education and technology center, the center shall receive 100% of the funding it received as a state-operated center in the first year and 75% of the funding it received thereafter; provide that the remaining 25% of the funds shall be distributed to locally-operated centers that did not receive state supplemental funds previously; amend KRS 156.844 to require that when a local board of education assumes management of a state-operated vocational education and technology center, the local board must serve all districts serviced by the state-operated center; provide that when a local board of education assumes management of a state-operated vocational education and technology center, transferred certified employees who had tenure may be granted tenure and classified employees with four years of previous service may be offered a contract for at least five years.
Title
AN ACT relating to career and technical education and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 322 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 1650 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 1650 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 40) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2021-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | returned to Education (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | 2nd reading |
2021-03-11 | House | taken from Education (H) |
2021-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-05 | House | to Education (H) |
2021-03-05 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-05 | House | 1st reading |
2021-03-05 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-05 | House | received in House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 4, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) as a consent bill |
2021-02-26 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | introduced in Senate |